TN SB0059 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, includes lineal descendants of original owners of private trust companies among those who may control a private trust. - Amends TCA Section 45-2-2001.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, includes lineal descendants of original owners of private trust companies among those who may control a private trust. - Amends TCA Section 45-2-2001.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-06 Pub. Ch. 26
2011-04-06 Effective date(s) 03/31/11
2011-03-31 Signed by Governor.
2011-03-23 Transmitted to Gov. for action.
2011-03-23 Signed by H. Speaker
2011-03-22 Signed by S. Speaker
2011-03-22 Enrolled and ready for signatures
2011-03-21 Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0
2011-03-21 Subst. for comp. HB.
2011-03-03 Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2011-02-28 Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
2011-02-28 Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0
2011-02-24 Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/28/2011
2011-02-22 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2011-02-16 Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. 1 cal. for 2/22/2011
2011-02-07 P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
2011-01-15 Intro., P1C.
2011-01-14 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1124 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 26

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback