TN SB0057 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Pub. Ch. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Pub. Ch. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates segment of S.R. 135 in Clay County as "Jerry Lee Denton Memorial Highway."
Title
As enacted, designates segment of S.R. 135 in Clay County as "Jerry Lee Denton Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Pub. Ch. 51 | |
2011-04-28 | Effective date(s) 04/11/11 | |
2011-04-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-03-31 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-03-31 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-03-30 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-03-29 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-03-28 | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2011-03-28 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-03-14 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-03-10 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-03-10 | Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2011-03-08 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/10/2011 | |
2011-03-08 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-03-03 | R/S #83(8) to be placed on S. F,W&M Con. Cal. for 3/8/2011 | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/8/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Rec. for pass; ref to S. FW&M Com. | |
2011-02-09 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 2/16/2011 | |
2011-02-07 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2011-01-15 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0274 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 51