TN SB0056 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Pub. Ch. 317
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Pub. Ch. 317
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that doctrine of joint and several liability does not apply in civil actions governed by comparative fault; preserves the doctrine of joint and several liability among manufacturers only in a product liability, but only if such action is based upon a theory of strict liability or breach of warranty. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 11, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, provides that doctrine of joint and several liability does not apply in civil actions governed by comparative fault; preserves the doctrine of joint and several liability among manufacturers only in a product liability, but only if such action is based upon a theory of strict liability or breach of warranty. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 11, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY Stewart PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY Stewart PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Pub. Ch. 317 |
2013-05-07 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2013 |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-16 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-04-15 | House | S. concurred in H. am. 1 |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/15/2013 |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 71, Nays 18 |
2013-04-11 | House | Am. 2 tabled. |
2013-04-11 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0371) |
2013-04-11 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 25, Nays 7, PNV 1 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0003) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/11/2013 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 5, Nays 4 PNV 0 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/5/2013 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1099 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 317