TN SB0056 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/12/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/12/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits both the driver and passenger of a motor vehicle from consuming an alcoholic beverage or possessing an open alcoholic beverage container within the passenger area. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, prohibits both the driver and passenger of a motor vehicle from consuming an alcoholic beverage or possessing an open alcoholic beverage container within the passenger area. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-22 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/22/2011 | |
2011-03-15 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/22/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/15/2011 | |
2011-02-07 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-01-15 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1016 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-02 - Assigned to s/c S&LG Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0056&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0056.pdf |