TN SB0056 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-21 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Trans Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-21 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Trans Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, suspends driver license of a student suspended for 10 or more days during a school year until the student reaches 18 years of age or for two years from the date of the 10th day of suspension, whichever is later, and provides that unlicensed student who is suspended for 10 or more days in a school year shall not be eligible for a driver license until reaching 18 years of age or for a period of two years from the date of the 10th day of suspension, whichever is later. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, suspends driver license of a student suspended for 10 or more days during a school year until the student reaches 18 years of age or for two years from the date of the 10th day of suspension, whichever is later, and provides that unlicensed student who is suspended for 10 or more days in a school year shall not be eligible for a driver license until reaching 18 years of age or for a period of two years from the date of the 10th day of suspension, whichever is later. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 55.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Trans Comm. | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/21/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0865 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-08 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0056&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0056.pdf |