TN SB0055 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates the professional art therapist advisory committee of the board of examiners in psychology to regulate the practice of art therapy. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates the professional art therapist advisory committee of the board of examiners in psychology to regulate the practice of art therapy. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/13/2019
2019-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-22SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0781 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback