TN SB0054 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a court ordering grandparent visitation to include at least two visits per month with the grandparent; provided, that the court may order less frequent visitation if agreed to by the grandparent. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires a court ordering grandparent visitation to include at least two visits per month with the grandparent; provided, that the court may order less frequent visitation if agreed to by the grandparent. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateDeferred to Summer Study
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-19SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/26/2019
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/19/2019
2019-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-19SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0122 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-26 - Def. to Summer Study in Children & Families Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback