TN SB0053 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/9/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/9/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows designated types of developments to adhere to the development standards that were in effect when the developments were approved; establishes an initial vesting period between one to three years in which the approval of a project shall remain valid and the project can be developed under the standards in existence at the time of approval. - Amends TCA Section 13-3-413 and Section 13-4-310.
Title
As introduced, allows designated types of developments to adhere to the development standards that were in effect when the developments were approved; establishes an initial vesting period between one to three years in which the approval of a project shall remain valid and the project can be developed under the standards in existence at the time of approval. - Amends TCA Section 13-3-413 and Section 13-4-310.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/9/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0033 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-27 - Failed In s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0053&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0053.pdf |