TN SB0051 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the department of mental health and substance abuse services to June 30, 2025. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 33.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 33, relative to the department of mental health and substance abuse services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-01SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2021-02-25SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/1/2021
2021-02-24SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-02-17SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/24/2021
2021-02-10SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/17/2021
2021-01-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0276 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-03 - Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback