TN SB0050 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Effective date(s) 03/06/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the prevailing wage commission to June 30, 2028. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 4, relative to the prevailing wage commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23 Effective date(s) 03/06/2023
2023-03-23 Pub. Ch. 8
2023-03-06SenateSigned by Governor.
2023-02-22SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-02-21HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-02-16SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-02-14SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-02-13HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-02-13HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2023-02-13SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-02-13SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2023-02-09SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/13/2023
2023-02-08SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-02-08SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-02-01SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/8/2023
2023-01-20SenateRefer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2023-01-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments
2023-01-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2022-12-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0216 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 8

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback