TN SB0047 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 108
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 108
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes municipalities located in Sevier County to impose certain privilege taxes to the same extent other municipalities located in the county have imposed such taxes by private act; specifies that 75 percent of the proceeds collected from any tax imposed pursuant to this bill will be used for tourism promotion; tourism infrastructure, including but not limited to, municipally-owned or operated event centers and golf courses; and tourism advertising. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As enacted, authorizes municipalities located in Sevier County to impose certain privilege taxes to the same extent other municipalities located in the county have imposed such taxes by private act; specifies that 75 percent of the proceeds collected from any tax imposed pursuant to this bill will be used for tourism promotion; tourism infrastructure, including but not limited to, municipally-owned or operated event centers and golf courses; and tourism advertising. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Overbey [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 108 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0098) |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/21/2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 4/19/2013 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/5/2013 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0023 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 108