TN SB0045 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes references to the antique motor vehicle registration fee consistent. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, makes references to the antique motor vehicle registration fee consistent. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 254 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 04/30/2019 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 84, Nays 12, PNV 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0170) |
2019-04-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0185) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0182 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 254