TN SB0043 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to second calendar of 2020
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes an electronic format of the report provided by the department to each member of the general assembly regarding the status of highway projects in the county or counties represented by the member. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 54; Title 55; Title 65 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes an electronic format of the report provided by the department to each member of the general assembly regarding the status of highway projects in the county or counties represented by the member. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 54; Title 55; Title 65 and Title 67.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to second calendar of 2020
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 4/3/2019
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-01-19SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-17SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0180 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Transportation Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback