TN SB0042 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes the date from March 1 to March 15 by which the commissioner of revenue must annually report the status of the computerized titling and registration system. - Amends TCA Title 55.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, changes the date from March 1 to March 15 by which the commissioner of revenue must annually report the status of the computerized titling and registration system. - Amends TCA Title 55.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-22SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-18SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-17HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-04-17HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0301)
2019-04-17HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0173)
2019-04-17HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-17SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-17SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-04-17SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0037)
2019-04-17SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0264)
2019-04-17SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0187)
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-09SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-01-19SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-17SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0179 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback