TN SB0041 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases, from 10 to 30, the number of days a utility facility owner located in a state right-of-way has to respond to a second relocation notice and the number of days an owner has to file a reservation of rights notice with the department of transportation. - Amends TCA Title 54.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases, from 10 to 30, the number of days a utility facility owner located in a state right-of-way has to respond to a second relocation notice and the number of days an owner has to file a reservation of rights notice with the department of transportation. - Amends TCA Title 54.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Rule 39(3) Motion to Adopt Amend# 2 by Yager (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-02SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-01SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-04-01SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0200)
2019-04-01SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0188)
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-01-19SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-17SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0178 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback