TN SB0041 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, provides for the naming of certain roads and bridges in honor of certain specified persons. - Amends TCA Title 54.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, provides for the naming of certain roads and bridges in honor of certain specified persons. - Amends TCA Title 54.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Rule 39(3) Motion to Adopt Amend# 2 by Yager (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Pub. Ch. 365
2019-05-15 Effective date(s) 05/10/2019
2019-05-10SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-05-02HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-02SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-02SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-30HousePassed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-30HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0174)
2019-04-30HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-04HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-02SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-01SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-04-01SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0200)
2019-04-01SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0188)
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-01-19SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-17SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0178 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 365

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback