TN SB0041 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes advisory task forces to study and report recommendations on electronic filing in state courts and the appointment of counsel for indigent defenses. - Amends TCA Title 16.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, establishes advisory task forces to study and report recommendations on electronic filing in state courts and the appointment of counsel for indigent defenses. - Amends TCA Title 16.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-08HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2015-04-06SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2015-04-06SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2015-04-06SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0314)
2015-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/6/2015
2015-03-31SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2015-03-25SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/31/2015
2015-03-24SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/31/2015
2015-03-18SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/24/2015
2015-03-10SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/24/2015
2015-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2015
2015-03-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/10/2015
2015-02-25SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/3/2015
2015-02-25SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2015-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/25/2015
2015-02-18SenateAction deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 2/25/2015
2015-02-11SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/18/2015
2015-02-03SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-01-17SenateRefer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2015-01-16SenatePassed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments.
2015-01-15SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-01-14SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0144 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-14 - Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to AOC

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback