TN SB0041 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-03 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, deletes provisions relative to state licensing of dog and cat dealers. - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, deletes provisions relative to state licensing of dog and cat dealers. - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 17.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-04-07 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-03 Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
2009-06-03 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/03/2009
2009-06-03 Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm.
2009-06-02 Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm to 6/3/09
2009-05-28 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/02/2009
2009-05-26 Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/2/2009
2009-05-21 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/26/2009
2009-05-20 Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/27/2009
2009-05-14 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/20/2009
2009-05-12 Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/19/2009
2009-05-07 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009
2009-05-06 Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/13/2009
2009-04-30 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/06/2009
2009-04-29 Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/6/2009
2009-04-23 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/29/2009
2009-04-07 Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2009-04-02 Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 04/07/2009
2009-03-31 Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 4/7/2009
2009-03-26 Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/31/2009
2009-03-24 Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/31/2009
2009-03-19 Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/24/2009
2009-03-17 Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/24/2009
2009-03-12 Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/17/2009
2009-03-10 Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/17/2009
2009-03-05 Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/10/2009
2009-02-11 P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
2009-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2009-01-28 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0113 (Crossfiled) 2010-01-25 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback