TN SB0039 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Effective date(s) 03/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the board of medical examiners' committee on physician assistants to June 30, 2026. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 19, relative to the board of medical examiners' committee on physician assistants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29 Effective date(s) 03/23/2021
2021-03-29 Pub. Ch. 7
2021-03-23SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-03-12SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-03-11HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-03-10SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-03-09SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-03-08HousePassed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 4
2021-03-08HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-03-08SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-08SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2021-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/8/2021
2021-03-03SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-02-24SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/3/2021
2021-01-13SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-01-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0265 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 7

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback