TN SB0039 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits state and local law enforcement agencies from owning or using certain military vehicles, aircraft, and weaponry; requires the divestiture or destruction of such vehicles, aircraft, or weaponry prior to January 1, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 1 and Title 38, Chapter 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits state and local law enforcement agencies from owning or using certain military vehicles, aircraft, and weaponry; requires the divestiture or destruction of such vehicles, aircraft, or weaponry prior to January 1, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 1 and Title 38, Chapter 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-25SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2015-01-17SenateRefer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2015-01-16SenatePassed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments.
2015-01-15SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-01-14SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1191 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback