TN SB0039 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-10 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the time period that a permanent disabled parking placard is valid from two to five years and adjusts fee from $3.00 to $7.50. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 21.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends the time period that a permanent disabled parking placard is valid from two to five years and adjusts fee from $3.00 to $7.50. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 21.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY McNally (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-01-10 Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2011-05-21 Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
2011-05-21 Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0
2011-05-21 S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0645)
2011-05-20 Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/21/2011
2011-05-20 Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2011-05-20 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/20/2011
2011-05-19 Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/20/2011
2011-05-19 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/19/2011
2011-05-18 Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to 5/19/2011
2011-05-17 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/18/2011
2011-03-16 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm.
2011-03-09 Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 3/16/2011
2011-01-15 P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
2011-01-14 Intro., P1C.
2011-01-13 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0206 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-19 - Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/19/2011

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback