TN SB0039 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 563
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, removes the requirement that in a divorce if a guardian ad litem has been appointed by the court, the guardian ad litem must agree to the parenting plan before the court can approve the parenting plan; specifies that when determining whether an agreement that allocates parenting responsibilities is in the best interests of the child, the court is authorized to consider any evidence submitted by a guardian ad litem appointed for the child, if one has been appointed by the court. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 4 and Title 36, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, removes the requirement that in a divorce if a guardian ad litem has been appointed by the court, the guardian ad litem must agree to the parenting plan before the court can approve the parenting plan; specifies that when determining whether an agreement that allocates parenting responsibilities is in the best interests of the child, the court is authorized to consider any evidence submitted by a guardian ad litem appointed for the child, if one has been appointed by the court. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 4 and Title 36, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-05-27 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-07-07 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 563
2009-06-03 Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
2009-06-02 Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/03/2009
2009-06-02 S. Reset on Cal. for 6/3/2009
2009-05-29 Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 06/02/2009
2009-05-27 Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2009-05-21 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/27/2009
2009-05-20 Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/27/2009
2009-05-20 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/20/2009
2009-05-19 Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/20/2009
2009-05-14 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/19/2009
2009-05-13 Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/19/2009
2009-05-13 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/13/2009
2009-05-12 Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/13/2009
2009-05-07 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009
2009-05-06 Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/12/2009
2009-05-06 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/06/2009
2009-05-05 Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009
2009-05-01 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009
2009-04-29 Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009
2009-04-23 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/29/2009
2009-04-23 Action def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 4/29/09
2009-04-16 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/22/2009
2009-02-11 P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2009-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2009-01-27 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0237 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-07 - Pub. Ch. 563

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback