TN SB0037 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, repeals requirements that authorization to engage in regulated professions and occupations be revoked for persons who default on student loans; requires reinstatement of licenses for otherwise qualified applicants whose licenses were suspended, denied, or revoked based solely on defaulting on student loan repayment. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 6, Part 3; Title 23, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 1; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62 and Title 63.
Title
As introduced, repeals requirements that authorization to engage in regulated professions and occupations be revoked for persons who default on student loans; requires reinstatement of licenses for otherwise qualified applicants whose licenses were suspended, denied, or revoked based solely on defaulting on student loan repayment. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 6, Part 3; Title 23, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 1; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62 and Title 63.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1108 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.