TN SB0036 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the area, from only Sevierville to include all of Sevier County, that is exempted from the required removal of tourist-oriented directional signs erected by an entity other than the department of transportation. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 5, Part 13.
Title
As enacted, expands the area, from only Sevierville to include all of Sevier County, that is exempted from the required removal of tourist-oriented directional signs erected by an entity other than the department of transportation. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 5, Part 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 23 | |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/16/2017 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/13/2017 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/13/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/6/2017 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0036 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 23