TN SB0034 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the Prospective Employee Credit Information Privacy Act, which prohibits an employer from failing or refusing to recruit or interview a prospective employee with respect to certain employment based on that person's credit information and creates a private cause of action for those injured due to violations by employers. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, enacts the Prospective Employee Credit Information Privacy Act, which prohibits an employer from failing or refusing to recruit or interview a prospective employee with respect to certain employment based on that person's credit information and creates a private cause of action for those injured due to violations by employers. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0010 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-06 - Withdrawn.