TN SB0033 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 274
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 274
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts diabetic testing supplies from sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, exempts diabetic testing supplies from sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 274 | |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/7/2015 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. Cal. on 4/7/15 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/recommend |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0122 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 274