TN SB0031 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits the death penalty as a punishment for defendants suffering from severe mental illness at the time of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits the death penalty as a punishment for defendants suffering from severe mental illness at the time of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateWithdrawn.
2019-02-12SenateRecalled from Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-01-19SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-01-18SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-11SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback