TN SB0028 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates the state Alzheimer's disease and related dementia advisory council. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 14 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates the state Alzheimer's disease and related dementia advisory council. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 14 and Title 71.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-02SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-01SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-04-01SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0095)
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-03-13SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/13/2019
2019-01-19SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0037 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback