TN SB0025 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, specifies that circuit and chancery courts' concurrent jurisdiction over divorce actions or actions to modify or alter a decree regarding child custody includes actions that contain allegations that a child is delinquent, unruly, or dependent and neglected; allows the circuit or chancery court to transfer an action to alter a custody decree that contains such an allegation to the juvenile court when appropriate. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 36 and Title 37.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, specifies that circuit and chancery courts' concurrent jurisdiction over divorce actions or actions to modify or alter a decree regarding child custody includes actions that contain allegations that a child is delinquent, unruly, or dependent and neglected; allows the circuit or chancery court to transfer an action to alter a custody decree that contains such an allegation to the juvenile court when appropriate. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 36 and Title 37.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30SenateWithdrawn.
2019-01-19SenateRefer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-01-18SenatePassed on Second Consideration, Held on Clerk's Desk pending committe appointments.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0069 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-28 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback