TN SB0024 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Pub. Ch. 133
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Pub. Ch. 133
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends limited sales tax refund for certain appliances, furniture, and building supplies purchased in response to May 2010 flood. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-396.
Title
As enacted, extends limited sales tax refund for certain appliances, furniture, and building supplies purchased in response to May 2010 flood. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-396.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Pub. Ch. 133 | |
2011-05-10 | Effective date(s) 05/02/11 | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-04-20 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-04-19 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-04-19 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-04-18 | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0 | |
2011-04-18 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-03-21 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-03-17 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-03-17 | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2011-03-15 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/17/2011 | |
2011-03-15 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/15/2011 | |
2011-02-15 | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/ recommend | |
2011-02-08 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2011-01-15 | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2011-01-14 | P2C, held on desk pending committee appointments | |
2011-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0006 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 133