TN SB0022 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 4/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 4/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes state agencies to contract with a licensed provider of child care services to offer child care services as an option for the agency's officers and employees. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 49 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 49 and Title 71, relative to child care services for state employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] |
Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective date(s) 4/28/2021 | |
2021-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 238 | |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0078) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-04-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0078) |
2021-04-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, Aye 31, Nays 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1114 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 238