TN SB0021 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-20 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a process by which the owner of a hospital closed for 15 years or less may submit an application to the health services and development agency to resume operations without a certificate of need in certain circumstances; requires the HSDA to review and notify the applicant of its determination within 60 days. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 16.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 16, relative to certificates of need.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-20SenateWithdrawn.
2021-01-20SenateRecalled from Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2021-01-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-12-17SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback