TN SB0018 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the statutes of limitation for certain sexual offenses committed against children when the crime was not reported to law enforcement within three years of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 2, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends the statutes of limitation for certain sexual offenses committed against children when the crime was not reported to law enforcement within three years of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 2, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-01-19SenateRefer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-01-09SenatePassed on Second Consideration, Held on desk pending committee appointments
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0285 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback