TN SB0016 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 507
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Sports Gaming Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 14; Title 38; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 5; Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 49 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Sports Gaming Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 14; Title 38; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 5; Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 49 and Title 67.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 507
2019-04-30SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-24SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 2 PNV 0
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-23SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-10SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/10/2019
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-03-27SenateRefer to Senate State & Local Government Committee w/ negative recommendation, as amended
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/27/2019
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
2019-01-19SenateRefer to Senate Govenment Operations Committee
2019-01-09SenatePassed on Second Consideration, Held on desk pending committee appointments
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-12-18SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0001 (Crossfiled) 2019-06-04 - Pub. Ch. 507

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback