TN SB0013 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Korean Defense Service specialty license plate for issuance to eligible veterans and military service members. - Amends TCA Section 55-4-253.
Title
As introduced, creates the Korean Defense Service specialty license plate for issuance to eligible veterans and military service members. - Amends TCA Section 55-4-253.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/20/2019 |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate Transportation & Safety Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, Held on desk pending committee appointments |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0718 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee