TN SB0011 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Pub. Ch. 429
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Pub. Ch. 429
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, subject to local approval, authorizes all-terrain vehicles on certain portions of state highways in Town of Huntsville in Scott County and Oliver Springs in Anderson County two weekends per year under certain circumstances; requires that any driver of an all-terrain vehicle authorized to be on a road or highway wear a helmet. - Amends TCA Section 55-3-101 and Title 55, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, subject to local approval, authorizes all-terrain vehicles on certain portions of state highways in Town of Huntsville in Scott County and Oliver Springs in Anderson County two weekends per year under certain circumstances; requires that any driver of an all-terrain vehicle authorized to be on a road or highway wear a helmet. - Amends TCA Section 55-3-101 and Title 55, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Randy McNally [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Pub. Ch. 429 | |
2015-05-26 | Effective date(s) 05/18/2015 | |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0274) |
2015-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-04-01 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0175) |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/18/2015 |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Transportation & Safety Committee |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0148 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 429