TN SB0010 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "JaJuan Latham Act," which increases the penalty for an aggravated assault or homicide that occurs by a person discharging a firearm from within a motor vehicle and the victim is a minor at the time of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "JaJuan Latham Act," which increases the penalty for an aggravated assault or homicide that occurs by a person discharging a firearm from within a motor vehicle and the victim is a minor at the time of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019
2019-04-24SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-23SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-02-12SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/12/2019
2019-02-05SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/12/2019
2019-01-30SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/5/2019
2019-01-19SenateRefer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-01-09SenatePassed on Second Consideration, Held on desk pending committee appointments
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-12-13SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0002 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback