TN SB0010 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "JaJuan Latham Act," which increases the penalty for an aggravated assault or homicide that occurs by a person discharging a firearm from within a motor vehicle and the victim is a minor at the time of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "JaJuan Latham Act," which increases the penalty for an aggravated assault or homicide that occurs by a person discharging a firearm from within a motor vehicle and the victim is a minor at the time of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 485 | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/12/2019 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/12/2019 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/5/2019 |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, Held on desk pending committee appointments |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0002 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 485