TN SB0004 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits the state board of education from adopting standards or competencies for social and emotional learning; prohibits the department of education from providing instruction or competencies in social and emotional learning to fulfill the requirements for character education. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2; Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Section 49-6-1007.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits the state board of education from adopting standards or competencies for social and emotional learning; prohibits the department of education from providing instruction or competencies in social and emotional learning to fulfill the requirements for character education. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2; Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Section 49-6-1007.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
2017-03-08SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-01-30SenateRefer to Senate Education Committee
2017-01-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2016-12-21SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-12-20SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-12-19SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0357 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback