TN SB0003 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits misrepresenting a product as meat or poultry that is not removed from the carcass of slaughtered livestock or poultry. - Amends TCA Title 44; Title 53 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits misrepresenting a product as meat or poultry that is not removed from the carcass of slaughtered livestock or poultry. - Amends TCA Title 44; Title 53 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-29SenateWithdrawn.
2019-01-29SenateRecalled from Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee
2019-01-19SenateRefer to Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee
2019-01-09SenatePassed on Second Consideration, Held on desk pending committee appointments
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-12-05SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback