TN SB0003 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates segment of U.S. Highway 27 in Rhea County as "Veterans Memorial Highway."
Title
As introduced, designates segment of U.S. Highway 27 in Rhea County as "Veterans Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/11/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Rec. for pass; ref to S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 2/6/2013 |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Ref. to S. T&S Comm. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | P2C Held on desk pending committee appointments |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0002 (Crossfiled) 2013-01-30 - P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee