TN SB0001 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes independent dispute resolution procedures for emergency services and balance bills. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to health care.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] |
Sen. Bill Powers [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0416) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0469) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 1/27/2022 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 1/27/2022 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 1/26/2022 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 1st Calendar of 2022 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/5/2021 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2020-11-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0002 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee