TN SB0001 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-30 - Refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits the Board for Professional Counselors, Marital and Family Therapists, and Clinical Pastoral Therapists from adopting any rule that incorporates by reference a national association's code of ethics, including, but not limited to, the American Counseling Association Code of Ethics; revises other provisions related to allowing counselors to not counsel when doing so conflicts with beliefs. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 49 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits the Board for Professional Counselors, Marital and Family Therapists, and Clinical Pastoral Therapists from adopting any rule that incorporates by reference a national association's code of ethics, including, but not limited to, the American Counseling Association Code of Ethics; revises other provisions related to allowing counselors to not counsel when doing so conflicts with beliefs. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 49 and Title 63.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-30SenateRefer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2017-01-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2016-12-02SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback