TN HR0263 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 66-25)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 66-25)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Roger Campbell
Title
Roger Campbell
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-26 | House | All Ayes added as Sponsors |
2018-03-26 | House | Adopted, Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-22 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3-26-18 |
2018-03-20 | House | Filed for intro. |