TN HR0257 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Eugene TeSelle
Title
Dr. Eugene TeSelle
Sponsors
Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. Sherry Jones [D] |
Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Mike Stewart [D] |
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-19 | House | Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2018-03-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-15 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3-19-18 |
2018-03-14 | House | Filed for intro. |