TN HR0170 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Keystone XL Pipeline workers
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and commend the Keystone XL pipeline workers for their commitment to America's energy independence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 77 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-11 | House | Adopted, Ayes 77, Nays 11, PNV 4 |
2022-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/22 |
2022-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/11/2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/31/22 |
2022-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2022-03-21 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/24/22 |
2022-03-21 | House | Filed for introduction |