TN HR0151 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Senator Janice Bowling
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and commend Senator Janice Bowling for her service to the citizens of Sequatchie County.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-15 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-14 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-10 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/14/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Filed for introduction |