TN HR0123 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Robert Dial
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and commend Robert Dial for his lifesaving actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-26 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-25 | House | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-21 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Filed for introduction |