TN HR0080 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
John S. Aitken
Title
John S. Aitken
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-18 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-18 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/19 |
2019-04-11 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-10 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/11/19 |
2019-04-09 | House | Filed for introduction |