TN HR0038 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Adopts the Rules of Practice and Procedure of the Board of Judicial Conduct.
Title
Adopts the Rules of Practice and Procedure of the Board of Judicial Conduct.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-03-19 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2013-03-18 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2013-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/18/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-14 | House | Intro., ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed for intro. |